Filed pursuant to Rule 497(e)
File Nos. 002-98772 and 811-04347
GMO TRUST
Supplement dated February 28, 2023, to the
GMO Trust Statement of Additional Information, dated June 30, 2022
Following the resignation of Carolyn Haley, Dina Santoro has been elected as a Trustee and President of GMO Trust by the GMO Trust Board of Trustees.
The “Independent Trustees” and “Interested Trustee and Officer” sections of the table on page 90 of the SAI are deleted and replaced with the following:
Name and Year of Birth | Position(s)
Held with the Trust | Length of Time Served | Principal Occupation(s) During Past 5 Years* | Number of Portfolios in Fund Complex1 Overseen | Other Directorships Held in the Past Five Years |
|||||
INDEPENDENT TRUSTEES | ||||||||||
Donald W. Glazer YOB: 1944 |
Chairman of the Board of Trustees | Chairman of the Board of Trustees since March 2005; Lead Independent Trustee (September 2004-March 2005); Trustee since December 2000. | Consultant – Law and Business; Author of Legal Treatises. | 33 | Director, BeiGene Ltd.(biotech). | |||||
Peter Tufano YOB: 1957 |
Trustee | Since December 2008. | Peter Moores Professor of Finance (Since July 1, 2011) and Peter Moores Dean and Professor of Finance (July 1, 2011 – June 30, 2021) University of Oxford, Said Business School. | 33 | None | |||||
Paul Braverman YOB: 1949 |
Trustee | Since March 2010. | Retired. | 33 | Trustee of HIMCO Variable Insurance Trust (27 Portfolios) (April 2014-April 2019). | |||||
INTERESTED TRUSTEE AND OFFICER | ||||||||||
Dina Santoro2 YOB: 1973 |
Trustee; President of the Trust | Trustee and President since February 2023. | Chief Operating Officer, Grantham, Mayo, Van Otterloo & Co. LLC (February 2023 – Present); President, Chief Executive Officer, and Director, Voya Investments, LLC, Voya Capital, LLC, and Voya Funds Services, LLC (September 2022 – December 2022); Director and Senior Vice President, Voya Investments Distributor, LLC (April 2018 –December 2022); Chief Operating Officer, Voya Investment Management (January 2022 –December 2022); Senior Managing Director, Head of Product and Marketing Strategy, Voya Investment Management (September 2017-December 2022). Formerly, President and Director, Voya Investments, LLC and Voya Capital, LLC (March 2018-September 2022); Director, Voya Funds Services, LLC (March 2018-September 2022). | 33 | Voya Separate Portfolios Trust (July 2018 – December 2022) |
1 | The Fund Complex includes series of each of GMO Trust. |
2 | Ms. Santoro is an “interested person” of the Trust, as such term is used in the 1940 Act (an “Interested Trustee”), by virtue of her positions with the Trust and GMO indicated in the table above and her interest as a member of GMO. |
The description on page 91 of the SAI of the attributes of the Interested Trustee considered by the Governance Committee is deleted and replaced with the following:
Interested Trustee
Dina Santoro — Ms. Santoro’s experience as a senior executive in the asset management industry, including her service as a mutual fund director and chief executive officer, her professional training and experience in business and finance, as well as her perspective on Board matters as a senior executive of GMO.
The first row of the table entitled “Officers” in the “Management of the Trust” section on page 91 of the SAI is deleted and replaced with the following:
Name and Year of Birth | Position(s) Held with the Trust | Length of Time Served | Principal Occupation(s) During Past 5 Years* | |||
Dina Santoro YOB: 1973 | Trustee; President of the Trust | Trustee and President since February 2023 | Chief Operating Officer, Grantham, Mayo, Van Otterloo & Co. LLC (February 2023 – Present); President, Chief Executive Officer, and Director, Voya Investments, LLC, Voya Capital, LLC, and Voya Funds Services, LLC (September 2022 – December 2022); Director and Senior Vice President, Voya Investments Distributor, LLC (April 2018 –December 2022); Chief Operating Officer, Voya Investment Management (January 2022 –December 2022); Senior Managing Director, Head of Product and Marketing Strategy, Voya Investment Management (September 2017-December 2022). Formerly, President and Director, Voya Investments, LLC and Voya Capital, LLC (March 2018-September 2022); Director, Voya Funds Services, LLC (March 2018-September 2022). |
2
The “Interested Trustee” subsections of the “Trustee Fund Ownership” tables on pages 95 and 96 of the SAI are deleted and replaced with the following:
Name/Funds |
Dollar Range of |
Aggregate Dollar
Range of Shares Directly |
INTERESTED TRUSTEE | ||
Dina Santoro | None | None |
Name/Funds |
Dollar Range of Shares Indirectly Owned in the Funds |
Aggregate Dollar
Range of Shares Indirectly |
INTERESTED TRUSTEE | ||
Dina Santoro | None | None |
The first sentence of the second paragraph on page 98 of the SAI is deleted and replaced with the following.
Ms. Santoro does not receive any compensation from the Fund Complex.
All other references to “Carolyn Haley” are replaced with references to “Dina Santoro”.
INVESTORS SHOULD RETAIN THIS SUPPLEMENT FOR FUTURE REFERENCE
3