Securities Act of 1933 Registration No. 002-90649
Investment Company Act of 1940 Registration No. 811-04008
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington, D.C. 20549
FORM N-1A
REGISTRATION STATEMENT UNDER THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933 [X]
[ ] Pre-Effective Amendment No. ______
[X] Post-Effective Amendment No. 201
and
REGISTRATION STATEMENT UNDER THE INVESTMENT COMPANY ACT OF 1940 [X]
[X] Amendment No. 201
Fidelity Investment Trust
(Exact Name of Registrant as Specified in Charter)
245 Summer Street, Boston, Massachusetts 02210
(Address of Principal Executive Offices)(Zip Code)
Registrant’s Telephone Number: 617-563-7000
Margaret Carey, Secretary and Chief Legal Officer
245 Summer Street
Boston, Massachusetts 02210
(Name and Address of Agent for Service)
[X] This Post-Effective Amendment designates a new effective date for a previously filed post-effective amendment.
The purpose of this Post-Effective Amendment is to designate a new effective date, May 10, 2023, for the Post-Effective Amendment previously filed on February 10, 2023, for the fund(s).
The Prospectus(es) and Statement(s) of Additional Information (SAI) for the fund(s) are identical to those filed in Post-Effective Amendment No. 200, the Part C is identical to the Part C filed in Post-Effective Amendment No. 200, and the Prospectus(es), SAI(s), and Part C are incorporated herein in their entirety by reference to those previously filed Post-Effective Amendments.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities Act of 1933 and the Investment Company Act of 1940, the Registrant certifies that it meets all of the requirements for the effectiveness of this Registration Statement pursuant to Rule 485(b) under the Securities Act of 1933 and has duly caused this Post-Effective Amendment No. 201 to the Registration Statement to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned, thereunto duly authorized, in the City of Boston, and Commonwealth of Massachusetts, on the 25th day of April 2023.
Fidelity Investment Trust | |||
By | /s/Stacie M. Smith | ||
Stacie M. Smith, President |
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities Act of 1933, this Registration Statement has been signed below by the following persons in the capacities and on the dates indicated.
(Signature) | (Title) | (Date) | |
/s/Stacie M. Smith | President and Treasurer | April 25, 2023 | |
Stacie M. Smith | (Principal Executive Officer) | ||
/s/ John J. Burke III | Chief Financial Officer | April 25, 2023 | |
John J. Burke III | (Principal Financial Officer) | ||
/s/Thomas P. Bostick | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Thomas P. Bostick | |||
/s/Jonathan Chiel | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Jonathan Chiel | |||
/s/Dennis J. Dirks | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Dennis J. Dirks | |||
/s/Donald F. Donahue | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Donald F. Donahue | |||
/s/Bettina Doulton | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Bettina Doulton | |||
/s/Vicki L. Fuller | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Vicki L. Fuller | |||
/s/Patricia L. Kampling | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Patricia L. Kampling | |||
/s/Thomas Kennedy | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Thomas Kennedy | |||
/s/Robert A. Lawrence | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Robert A. Lawrence | |||
/s/Oscar Munoz | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Oscar Munoz | |||
/s/David M. Thomas | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
David M. Thomas | |||
/s/Susan Tomasky | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Susan Tomasky | |||
/s/Michael E. Wiley | * | Trustee | April 25, 2023 |
Michael E. Wiley | |||
* | By: | /s/Megan C. Johnson |
Megan C. Johnson, pursuant to powers of attorney dated June 9, 2020, June 1, 2021, and January 11, 2023 and filed herewith. |
POWER OF ATTORNEY
I, the undersigned Trustee of the following investment companies:
Fidelity Advisor Series VIII Fidelity Concord Street Trust Fidelity Investment Trust | Fidelity Puritan Trust Fidelity Securities Fund Variable Insurance Products Fund |
in addition to any other Fidelity Fund for which the undersigned individual serves as Director or Trustee (collectively, the “Funds”), hereby constitute and appoint Thomas C. Bogle, John V. O’Hanlon, Robert W. Helm, Megan C. Johnson, and Anthony H. Zacharski, each of them singly, my true and lawful attorneys-in-fact, with full power of substitution, and with full power to each of them, to sign for me and in my name in the appropriate capacity, all Registration Statements of the Funds on Form N-1A, or any successors thereto, any and all subsequent Amendments, Pre-Effective Amendments, or Post-Effective Amendments to said Registration Statements or any successors thereto, and any supplements or other instruments in connection therewith, and generally to do all such things in my name and behalf in connection therewith as said attorneys-in-fact deem necessary or appropriate, to comply with the provisions of the Securities Act of 1933 and the Investment Company Act of 1940, and all related requirements of the Securities and Exchange Commission. I hereby ratify and confirm all that said attorneys-in-fact or their substitutes may do or cause to be done by virtue hereof. This power of attorney is effective for all documents filed on or after June 9, 2020.
WITNESS my hand on this 9th day of June, 2020.
/s/ Jonathan Chiel | |
Jonathan Chiel |
POWER OF ATTORNEY
We, the undersigned Directors or Trustees, as the case may be, of the following investment companies:
Fidelity Advisor Series I Fidelity Advisor Series VII Fidelity Advisor Series VIII Fidelity Capital Trust Fidelity Commonwealth Trust Fidelity Commonwealth Trust II Fidelity Concord Street Trust Fidelity Contrafund Fidelity Covington Trust Fidelity Destiny Portfolios Fidelity Devonshire Trust Fidelity Financial Trust | Fidelity Hastings Street Trust Fidelity Investment Trust Fidelity Magellan Fund Fidelity Mt. Vernon Street Trust Fidelity Puritan Trust Fidelity Securities Fund Fidelity Select Portfolios Fidelity Summer Street Trust Fidelity Trend Fund Variable Insurance Products Fund Variable Insurance Products Fund II Variable Insurance Products Fund III Variable Insurance Products Fund IV |
in addition to any other investment company for which Fidelity Management & Research Company (“FMR”) or an affiliate acts as investment adviser and for which the undersigned individuals serve as Directors or Trustees (collectively, the “Funds”), hereby revoke all previous powers of attorney we have given to sign and otherwise act in our names and behalf in matters involving any investment company for which FMR or an affiliate acts as investment adviser and hereby constitute and appoint Thomas C. Bogle, John V. O’Hanlon, Megan C. Johnson, and Anthony H. Zacharski, each of them singly, our true and lawful attorneys-in-fact, with full power of substitution, and with full power to each of them, to sign for us and in our names in the appropriate capacities, all Registration Statements of the Funds on Form N-1A, or any successors thereto, any and all subsequent Amendments, Pre-Effective Amendments, or Post-Effective Amendments to said Registration Statements or any successors thereto, and any supplements or other instruments in connection therewith, and generally to do all such things in our names and behalf in connection therewith as said attorneys–in-fact deem necessary or appropriate, to comply with the provisions of the Securities Act of 1933 and the Investment Company Act of 1940, and all related requirements of the Securities and Exchange Commission. We hereby ratify and confirm all that said attorneys-in-fact or their substitutes may do or cause to be done by virtue hereof. This power of attorney is effective for all documents filed on or after June 1, 2021.
WITNESS our hands on this first day of June 2021.
/s/Thomas P. Bostick | /s/Oscar Munoz |
Thomas P.Bostick | Oscar Munoz |
POWER OF ATTORNEY
We, the undersigned Directors or Trustees, as the case may be, of the following investment companies:
Fidelity Advisor Series I Fidelity Advisor Series VII Fidelity Advisor Series VIII Fidelity Capital Trust Fidelity Commonwealth Trust Fidelity Commonwealth Trust II Fidelity Concord Street Trust Fidelity Contrafund Fidelity Covington Trust Fidelity Destiny Portfolios Fidelity Devonshire Trust Fidelity Financial Trust | Fidelity Hastings Street Trust Fidelity Investment Trust Fidelity Magellan Fund Fidelity Mt. Vernon Street Trust Fidelity Puritan Trust Fidelity Securities Fund Fidelity Select Portfolios Fidelity Summer Street Trust Fidelity Trend Fund Variable Insurance Products Fund Variable Insurance Products Fund II Variable Insurance Products Fund III Variable Insurance Products Fund IV |
in addition to any other investment company for which Fidelity Management & Research Company (“FMR”) or an affiliate acts as investment adviser and for which the undersigned individuals serve as Directors or Trustees (collectively, the “Funds”), hereby revoke all previous powers of attorney we have given to sign and otherwise act in our names and behalf in matters involving any investment company for which FMR or an affiliate acts as investment adviser and hereby constitute and appoint Thomas C. Bogle, John V. O’Hanlon, Megan C. Johnson, and Anthony H. Zacharski, each of them singly, our true and lawful attorneys-in-fact, with full power of substitution, and with full power to each of them, to sign for us and in our names in the appropriate capacities, all Registration Statements of the Funds on Form N-1A, or any successors thereto, any and all subsequent Amendments, Pre-Effective Amendments, or Post-Effective Amendments to said Registration Statements or any successors thereto, and any supplements or other instruments in connection therewith, and generally to do all such things in our names and behalf in connection therewith as said attorneys–in-fact deem necessary or appropriate, to comply with the provisions of the Securities Act of 1933 and the Investment Company Act of 1940, and all related requirements of the Securities and Exchange Commission. We hereby ratify and confirm all that said attorneys-in-fact or their substitutes may do or cause to be done by virtue hereof. This power of attorney is effective for all documents filed on or after January 11, 2023.
WITNESS our hands on this eleventh day of January 2023.
/s/Dennis J. Dirks | /s/Robert A. Lawrence |
Dennis J. Dirks | Robert A. Lawrence |
/s/Donald F. Donahue | /s/David M. Thomas |
Donald F. Donahue | David M. Thomas |
/s/Bettina Doulton | /s/Susan Tomasky |
Bettina Doulton | Susan Tomasky |
/s/Vicki L. Fuller | /s/Michael E. Wiley |
Vicki L. Fuller | Michael E. Wiley |
/s/Patricia L. Kampling | |
Patricia L. Kampling | |
/s/Thomas Kennedy | |
Thomas Kennedy |