Commission File Number 001-31914
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington, D.C. 20549
FORM 6-K
Report of Foreign Private Issuer
Pursuant to Rule 13a-16 or 15d-16 of the
Securities Exchange Act of 1934
July 29, 2016
China Life Insurance Company Limited
(Translation of registrants name into English)
16 Financial Street
Xicheng District
Beijing 100033, China
Tel: (86-10) 6363-3333
(Address of principal executive offices)
Indicate by check mark whether the registrant files or will file annual reports under cover Form 20-F or Form 40-F:
Form 20-F x Form 40-F ¨
Indicate by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form 6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(1): ¨
Indicate by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form 6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(7): ¨
Indicate by check mark whether by furnishing the information contained in this Form, the registrant is also thereby furnishing the information to the Commission pursuant to Rule 12g3-2(b) under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934:
Yes ¨ No x
If Yes is marked, indicate below the file number assigned to the registrant in connection with Rule 12g3-2(b): 82-
Commission File Number 001-31914
China Life Insurance Company Limited issued an announcement on July 29, 2016, a copy of which is attached as Exhibit 99.1 hereto.
EXHIBIT LIST
Exhibit | Description | |
99.1 | Announcement, dated July 29, 2016 |
Commission File Number 001-31914
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned, thereunto duly authorized.
China Life Insurance Company Limited | ||||||
(Registrant) | ||||||
By: | /s/ Lin Dairen | |||||
(Signature) | ||||||
July 29, 2016 | Name: | Lin Dairen | ||||
Title: | President and Executive Director |
Exhibit 99.1
Commission File Number 001-31914
CHINA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED
(A joint stock limited company incorporated in the Peoples Republic of China with limited liability)
(Stock Code: 2628)
ANNOUNCEMENT
APPROVAL OF QUALIFICATION OF
INDEPENDENT DIRECTOR BY THE CIRC
Reference is made to the announcement of China Life Insurance Company Limited (the Company) dated 30 May 2016 in relation to, among others, the election of Ms. Leung Oi-Sie Elsie as an Independent Director of the fifth session of the board of directors as the successor of the retiring Director Mr. Anthony Francis Neoh at the Annual General Meeting 2015 (the AGM) of the Company held on the same day.
The Company has recently received the approval of qualification of Leung Oi-Sie Elsie as Director issued by the China Insurance Regulatory Commission (the CIRC). Pursuant to the approval, the qualification of Ms. Leung Oi-Sie Elsie as an Independent Director of the Company has been approved by the CIRC. The term of office of Ms. Leung Oi-Sie Elsie commenced on 20 July 2016. With effect from the same day, Ms. Leung Oi-Sie Elsie began to serve as the Chairman of the Risk Management Committee and a member of the Strategy and Investment Decision Committee. Please refer to the circular of the AGM dated 11 April 2016 and the announcement of the Company dated 30 May 2016 for the biographical details of Ms. Leung Oi-Sie Elsie.
With effect from 20 July 2016, being the date when the appointment of Ms. Leung Oi-Sie Elsie became effective, Mr. Anthony Francis Neoh has ceased to be an Independent Director of the Company, the Chairman of the Risk Management Committee and a member of the Strategy and Investment Decision Committee.
By Order of the Board
China Life Insurance Company Limited
Heng Victor Ja Wei
Company Secretary
Hong Kong, 29 July 2016
As at the date of this announcement, the board of director of the Company comprises:
Executive Directors: | Yang Mingsheng, Lin Dairen, Xu Hengping, Xu Haifeng | |
Non-executive Directors: | Miao Jianmin, Zhang Xiangxian, Wang Sidong, Liu Jiade | |
Independent Non-executive Directors: | Chang Tso Tung Stephen, Robinson Drake Pike, Tang Xin, Leung Oi-Sie Elsie |